Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Sciali

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1833AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
13 Jul 1834Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
1839¹ResignedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
20 Aug 1854DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Skopje, Macedonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Sciali:
Archbishop Pietro Sciali (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013