Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Zane (Zanni)

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
31 Aug 149848.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
15 Feb 150353.1AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
5 Jan 152474.0DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Zane (Zanni) (VIAF: 122178053)
Archbishop Bernardo Zane (Zanni) (born 1450, died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 302
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 5*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Apr 2018