Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Contarini, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450Born
29 Nov 150858.9AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
4 Feb 150959.0Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
7 Oct 152474.7DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Contarini
Patriarch Antonio Contarini C.R.S.A. (born 1450, died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCastello

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 8 Feb 2017
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast