Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mattias Dvornik

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1847BornSplit
31 Oct 186922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
4 Sep 190154.4AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
29 Sep 190154.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
1910¹62.7ResignedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
14 Jul 191467.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mattias Dvornik:
Archbishop Mattias Dvornik (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013