Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Riario, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Administrator of Mende

Bishop of Split (Spalato)

Administrator of Sevilla {Seville}

Administrator of Valence and Die


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1445BornSavona
4 Sep 147126.3AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
16 Dec 147126.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 147126.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
23 Sep 147227.4AppointedAdministrator of Valence and Die, France
23 Nov 147227.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
28 Apr 147328.0AppointedBishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
25 Jun 147328.1AppointedAdministrator of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Jul 147328.2AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
3 Nov 147328.5AppointedAdministrator of Mende, France
3 Jan 147428.7DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Riario:
Pietro Cardinal Riario O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a cardinal for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1471
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015