Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Laghi, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1665BornVenice
29 Sep 168822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
15 Apr 172054.4AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
28 Apr 172054.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
11 Feb 173064.2DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Laghi:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Laghi C.R.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015