Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Lorenzo Zanni (Zane)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1429¹Born
5 Jun 145223.4AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
13 Mar 145829.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
28 Apr 147344.3AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
28 Apr 147344.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
27 Feb 147849.1AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
1480¹51.0ResignedBishop of Brescia, Italy
15 Oct 148556.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Zanni (Zane) (VIAF: 258095764)
Patriarch Lorenzo Zanni (Zane) (born 1429, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111, and Page 240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 249, and Page 89
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 164
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1452, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast