Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo Bondumier

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Split (Spalato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornVenezia, Italy
15 Apr 164136.2AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
21 Apr 164136.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
1668¹63.0ResignedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Bondumier
Archbishop Leonardo Bondumier (born 1605) Archbishop Emeritus of Split (Spalato)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 23
  • ob/c2: AT, 15 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Sep 2016