Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabijan Blasković

Deceased

Bishop of Makarska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1729BornSolta
24 Dec 175223.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 177748.2SelectedBishop of Makarska, Croatia
15 Dec 177748.5ConfirmedBishop of Makarska, Croatia
1778²48.6Ordained BishopBishop of Makarska, Croatia
1820¹90.6DiedBishop of Makarska, Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabijan Blasković:
Bishop Fabijan Blasković (born , died 1820) Bishop of Makarska

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016