Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietrangelo Ruggieri

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1721Born
26 Mar 174624.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 175938.0AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
30 Sep 175938.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
14 Feb 180785.4DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietrangelo Ruggieri
Bishop Pietrangelo Ruggieri (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePescosolido

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,759, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast