Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Morozzo

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1722Born
3 May 174724.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 176239.2SelectedBishop of Fossano, Italy
19 Apr 176239.4ConfirmedBishop of Fossano, Italy
2 May 176239.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
29 Jun 176239.6InstalledBishop of Fossano, Italy
18 Nov 179977.0DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Morozzo
Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Morozzo (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFossano, Diocese of Fossano
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Fossano, Diocese of Fossano

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 29
  • ob/c2: AT, 16 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,655

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast