Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Francesco Rolfi, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1727Born
21 Feb 175022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
18 Jun 178356.3SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
18 Jul 178356.4ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
28 Sep 178356.5Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
15 Jun 178962.3DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Francesco Rolfi
Bishop Giacinto Francesco Rolfi O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Iglesias

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreduli

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018