Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Curlo, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1692BornGenova
1708¹16.0ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular Minor
22 Dec 171422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular Minor
29 May 174149.4AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
2 Jul 174149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
27 Dec 174957.9DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Curlo:
Bishop Girolamo Curlo C.R.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Aleria

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013