Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano di Leoni

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1701³BornCatharen
20 Apr 172625.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 175453.6AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
22 Sep 175453.6Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
May 1776³75.3DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano di Leoni:
Bishop Stefano di Leoni (born ) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013