Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Ignatius Antonio Sersale, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1686Born
22 Dec 170822.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
9 Nov 171024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
28 Feb 174861.3SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
1 Apr 174861.4ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
7 Apr 174861.4Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
18 Jul 174962.7DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Ignatius Antonio Sersale
Bishop Tommaso Ignatius Antonio Sersale C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosenza

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1749
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast