Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Francisco de Nobili

Deceased

Bishop of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1713BornMonte Sant'Angelo
10 Feb 173724.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 177259.6AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
13 Sep 177259.6Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
Nov 177461.8DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Francisco de Nobili:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Francisco de Nobili (born ) Bishop of Larino

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013