Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adelmo Gennaro Pignatelli di Belmonte, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1728Born
25 Mar 175223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 May 177041.6AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
3 Jun 177041.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
15 Dec 177749.2AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
9 Nov 178557.1DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adelmo Gennaro Pignatelli di Belmonte
Archbishop Adelmo Gennaro Pignatelli di Belmonte O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116, and Page 147
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018