Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Russo

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1717BornNapoli
23 Sep 174124.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 176850.8SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
16 May 176850.9ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
22 May 176850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
6 Oct 177962.3SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
20 Mar 178062.7ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1783¹65.5DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Russo:
Bishop Domenico Russo (born , died 1783) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 294, and Page 347
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015