Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Stabile

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1706BornMartina
25 Mar 173024.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 173024.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 175448.1AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
23 May 175448.1Ordained BishopBishop of Venafro, Italy
1 Dec 178882.7DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Stabile:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Stabile (born , died ) Bishop of Venafro

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015