Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Vivani

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino, Italy

Bishop of Fabriano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1695Born
24 Sep 171823.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 174045.1AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
13 Nov 174045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
18 Apr 174650.5AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
18 Apr 174650.5AppointedBishop of Fabriano, Italy
30 Dec 176772.2DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Vivani
Bishop Francesco Vivani (born , died ) Bishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsimo

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 143, and Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018