Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ de Amato

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1701Born
23 Dec 172422.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 174947.5AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
25 Jul 174947.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
31 Aug 178987.6DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ de Amato
Bishop NicolÚ de Amato (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,749, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast