Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Du Mesnil

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1716BornOherville Toul
30 May 174427.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 174831.7AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
19 May 174831.7Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
13 Mar 178164.6DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Du Mesnil:
Bishop Giuseppe Du Mesnil (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 445
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015