Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Joseph Antoine de los Reyes

Deceased

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1694Born
22 May 171722.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 175561.5SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
5 Apr 175661.8ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
18 Apr 175661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
19 Feb 176974.7DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for François Joseph Antoine de los Reyes
Bishop François Joseph Antoine de los Reyes (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrindisi

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018