Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bucarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1705Born
19 Feb 173024.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Feb 173024.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 176963.6AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
18 Jun 176963.6Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
Apr 1780²74.4DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bucarelli
Bishop Giuseppe Bucarelli (born , died Apr 1780) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,769, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 403
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast