Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco d’Afflitto

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1721³BornRavello
19 Dec 174423.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 176745.6AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
12 Jul 176745.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
24 Sep 178664.8DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco d’Afflitto:
Bishop Francesco d’Afflitto (born , died ) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015