Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Galletti

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1711BornMonte San Savino
21 Apr 175341.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176856.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Volterra, Italy
25 Jan 176856.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
31 Jan 176856.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
13 Mar 178169.8SucceededBishop of Volterra, Italy
2 Jun 178271.0DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Galletti:
Bishop Alessandro Galletti (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 383, and Page 445
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 12 Dec 2015