Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Saverio Pulci

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1699BornNapoli
13 Mar 172323.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 175454.4SelectedBishop of Ariano, Italy
20 May 175454.6ConfirmedBishop of Ariano, Italy
23 May 175454.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
Oct 1777³77.9DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Saverio Pulci:
Bishop Domenico Saverio Pulci (born ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015