Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Maria Vannucci

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1715Born
19 Dec 173924.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 177055.1AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
16 Dec 177055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
7 Aug 179377.8DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Vannucci
Bishop Pietro Maria Vannucci (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFucecchio

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,770, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast