Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Rovčro

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1704Born
20 Dec 172723.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 172723.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 174844.0AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
28 Jul 174844.0Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
10 Sep 175652.1DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Rovčro
Bishop Ignazio Rovčro (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast