Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honuphrius Belsito

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lavello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1697BornRogliano
8 Mar 172123.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 174547.6AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
23 May 174547.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
23 Nov 175255.2ResignedBishop of Lavello, Italy
11 Sep 176467.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lavello, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Honuphrius Belsito:
Bishop Honuphrius Belsito (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lavello

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015