Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Cristiani

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1704³BornVarise
6 Oct 172723.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 174742.6AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
16 Apr 174742.6Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
21 Oct 176561.1DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Cristiani:
Bishop Pietro Cristiani (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015