Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Maria Capece, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1720BornNapoli
1737¹16.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
21 Jan 174222.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
29 Feb 174424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
18 Dec 176949.9AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
24 Dec 176949.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
16 Dec 179171.9SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pozzuoli, Italy
27 Feb 179272.1ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pozzuoli, Italy
3 May 179272.2InstalledArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pozzuoli, Italy
Jun 1794³74.3DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Capece:
Archbishop Gaetano Maria Capece C.R. (born , died Jun 1794) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350, and Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015