Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Lanza, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1728Born
1744¹15.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
3 Sep 175224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 Oct 176941.1SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
20 Nov 176941.2ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
30 Nov 176941.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
24 May 177546.7DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lanza
Bishop Antonio Lanza C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontismelli

  • a priest for 22.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018