Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcello Papiniano-Cusani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1690³BornFrasco
10 Jun 171323.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 175262.8SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
12 Mar 175363.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
18 Mar 175363.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
17 Jan 175463.9SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
11 Feb 175463.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
16 Jun 176272.3ResignedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
1766¹75.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcello Papiniano-Cusani:
Archbishop Marcello Papiniano-Cusani (born , died 1766) Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 238, and Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 12 Nov 2015