Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Loup de Sallières de Fausseran

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1682³BornAvignon
29 May 170623.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Jun 170724.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 174866.2AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
8 Dec 174866.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
Aug 1758³75.8DiedBishop of Vaison, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Loup de Sallières de Fausseran:
Bishop Paul-Loup de Sallières de Fausseran (born , died Aug 1758) Bishop of Vaison

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 433
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015