Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Mollo

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1696Born
27 Feb 173538.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Mar 173538.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 173943.2AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
8 Dec 173943.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
20 Jul 176164.9DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Mollo
Bishop Bartolomeo Mollo (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLusciano

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018