Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Baratta, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1691Born
29 Sep 172635.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Oct 172635.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 172736.0ProfessedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
29 Jan 174856.4AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
18 Feb 174856.4Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
11 Apr 174856.6DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Baratta
Bishop Giovanni Battista Baratta C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossano

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018