Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste D’Orliè De Saint Innocent, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1705Born
30 Nov 173227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
9 Apr 174943.8SelectedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
5 May 174943.8ConfirmedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
11 May 174943.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
11 Oct 179489.3DiedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste D’Orliè De Saint Innocent
Bishop Jean Baptiste D’Orliè De Saint Innocent C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambery

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 338
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018