Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Scoppa

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1713Born
20 Apr 173723.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 174733.9AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
23 May 174734.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ostuni, Italy
25 Feb 178268.7DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Scoppa
Bishop Francesco Antonio Scoppa (born , died ) Bishop of Ostuni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Caterina

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,747, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast