Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique (Wilhelm Philipp) Gentis, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1696BornHerculis Castris
22 Nov 171923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Mar 174852.0SelectedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
5 May 174953.2ConfirmedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
11 May 174953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
3 Jul 175862.3DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Dominique (Wilhelm Philipp) Gentis:
Bishop Dominique (Wilhelm Philipp) Gentis O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1750
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 89
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013