Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Passanti

Deceased

Bishop of Montemarano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1702³BornSalces
8 Mar 172725.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 172725.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 175351.4AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
25 Jul 175351.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
31 Mar 177472.1DiedBishop of Montemarano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Passanti:
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Passanti (born , died ) Bishop of Montemarano

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015