Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pellegrino Ferri

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1699BornPatavin
1 Apr 172424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
16 Nov 175051.0AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
22 Nov 175051.0Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
30 Sep 175757.8DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino Ferri:
Bishop Pellegrino Ferri (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013