Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria Castelvetri

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1710BornModena
20 Dec 173222.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 175040.9AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
13 Dec 175040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
4 Apr 178575.2DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Castelvetri:
Bishop Giovanni Maria Castelvetri (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013