Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Broccoli

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1706Born
29 Sep 172923.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 176761.3AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
21 Dec 176761.3Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
Jul 1775³68.8DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Broccoli
Bishop Francesco Broccoli (born , died Jul 1775) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSessa Aurunca, Diocese of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast