Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Vincentini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Naples

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1717³BornRieti, Italy
11 Sep 177558.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
22 Oct 177558.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
23 Jan 177658.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Oct 1779³62.4DiedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vincentini
Archbishop Giuseppe Vincentini (born , died Oct 1779) Apostolic Nuncio of Naples

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1775, Number 45
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016