Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Ferretti

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1740BornAncona
2 Mar 176524.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 177535.3AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
23 Jul 177535.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Sep 177939.5AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
18 Jun 180666.2DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ferretti
Bishop Vincenzo Ferretti (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 354
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016