Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitale Giuseppe de’ Buoi

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1732BornBologna
24 May 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 176735.3AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
4 Oct 176735.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
28 Jan 178754.7DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vitale Giuseppe de’ Buoi:
Bishop Vitale Giuseppe de’ Buoi (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013