Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Sparano

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1709BornNapoli
20 Dec 173223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
19 Apr 177565.3SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
29 May 177565.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
4 Jun 177565.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
5 Jun 177666.5DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Sparano:
Archbishop Giuseppe Sparano (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 19 Sep 2013