Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano de Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1729BornArzano
18 Mar 175223.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177546.8AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
19 Nov 177546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
16 Dec 179162.8SelectedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
26 Mar 179263.1ConfirmedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
14 May 181081.3DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano de Rosa:
Bishop Sebastiano de Rosa (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111, and Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015