Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Evangelista Stefanini

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1714Born
15 Jun 173722.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 177156.6AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
17 Mar 177156.6Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
26 Apr 177560.7DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Evangelista Stefanini
Bishop Giovanni Evangelista Stefanini (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallese

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,771, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast